|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 306, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4907.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4742.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4565.) Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6292.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5812.) Re-referred to Com. On E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3036.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 518.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 397.)
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV. Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|