LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB211
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB211
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB211
Compare Versions
SB211 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB211 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB211 Amended August 2, 2010
SB211 Amended June 24, 2010
SB211 Amended September 4, 2009
SB211 Amended July 1, 2009
SB211 Amended June 8, 2009
SB211 Amended April 14, 2009
SB211 Amended March 26, 2009
SB211 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB211 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB211 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB211 Amended August 2, 2010
SB211 Amended June 24, 2010
SB211 Amended September 4, 2009
SB211 Amended July 1, 2009
SB211 Amended June 8, 2009
SB211 Amended April 14, 2009
SB211 Amended March 26, 2009
SB211 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare