|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2376.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3079.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 1174.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 885.) Set for hearing May 14. From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 914.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 849.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|