LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB213
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB213
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB213
Compare Versions
SB213 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB213 Amended June 18, 2009
SB213 Amended June 1, 2009
SB213 Amended May 18, 2009
SB213 Amended May 5, 2009
SB213 Amended April 15, 2009
SB213 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB213 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB213 Amended June 18, 2009
SB213 Amended June 1, 2009
SB213 Amended May 18, 2009
SB213 Amended May 5, 2009
SB213 Amended April 15, 2009
SB213 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare