|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 570, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 1908.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 2608.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 621.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 397.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV. Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|