LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB215
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB215
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB215
Compare Versions
SB215 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB215 Enrolled August 25, 2009
SB215 Amended June 22, 2009
SB215 Amended May 12, 2009
SB215 Amended March 26, 2009
SB215 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB215 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB215 Enrolled August 25, 2009
SB215 Amended June 22, 2009
SB215 Amended May 12, 2009
SB215 Amended March 26, 2009
SB215 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare