|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6831.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6624.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6437.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Heard in committee on May 6.)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 4264.) To third reading. Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 824.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 586.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|