LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB220
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB220
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB220
Compare Versions
SB220 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB220 Amended August 24, 2010
SB220 Amended August 20, 2010
SB220 Amended August 16, 2010
SB220 Amended June 24, 2010
SB220 Amended May 26, 2010
SB220 Amended March 11, 2010
SB220 Amended July 16, 2009
SB220 Amended July 2, 2009
SB220 Amended April 13, 2009
SB220 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB220 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB220 Amended August 24, 2010
SB220 Amended August 20, 2010
SB220 Amended August 16, 2010
SB220 Amended June 24, 2010
SB220 Amended May 26, 2010
SB220 Amended March 11, 2010
SB220 Amended July 16, 2009
SB220 Amended July 2, 2009
SB220 Amended April 13, 2009
SB220 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare