|
08/19/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1011.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 725.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|