|
06/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4094.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4070.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4037.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5743.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5695.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1190.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 1069.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 637.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|