LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB227
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB227
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB227
Compare Versions
SB227 Chaptered June 29, 2010
SB227 Enrolled June 28, 2010
SB227 Amended June 21, 2010
SB227 Amended June 3, 2010
SB227 Amended July 13, 2009
SB227 Amended May 28, 2009
SB227 Amended April 13, 2009
SB227 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB227 Chaptered June 29, 2010
SB227 Enrolled June 28, 2010
SB227 Amended June 21, 2010
SB227 Amended June 3, 2010
SB227 Amended July 13, 2009
SB227 Amended May 28, 2009
SB227 Amended April 13, 2009
SB227 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare