|
06/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. (Heard in committee May 20).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1174.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1069.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 608.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|