LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB244
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB244
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB244
Compare Versions
SB244 Amended June 22, 2010
SB244 Amended March 18, 2010
SB244 Amended July 8, 2009
SB244 Amended June 1, 2009
SB244 Amended May 20, 2009
SB244 Amended May 4, 2009
SB244 Amended March 31, 2009
SB244 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB244 Amended June 22, 2010
SB244 Amended March 18, 2010
SB244 Amended July 8, 2009
SB244 Amended June 1, 2009
SB244 Amended May 20, 2009
SB244 Amended May 4, 2009
SB244 Amended March 31, 2009
SB244 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare