|
06/28/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5803.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 18. Page 1147.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1067.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 677.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|