LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB25
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB25
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB25
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 1, 2008
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 21, 2010
Compare
Bill
May 28, 2009
Compare
Bill
May 6, 2009
Compare
Bill
April 13, 2009
Compare