|
08/31/2010
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 42. Noes. 27. Page 6961.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 40. Page 6978.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Motion to reconsider continued to August 31.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 34. Noes 40. Page 6757.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Blumenfield.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6372.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6329.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Evans.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 3302.) Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Blumenfield.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Motion to reconsider continued to next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 42. Page 3124.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Blumenfield.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1144.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 15. Page 1112.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Florez. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1112.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1069.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 498.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|