LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB250
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB250
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB250
Compare Versions
SB250 Amended August 18, 2010
SB250 Amended August 31, 2009
SB250 Amended May 28, 2009
SB250 Amended May 5, 2009
SB250 Amended April 21, 2009
SB250 Amended April 2, 2009
SB250 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB250 Amended August 18, 2010
SB250 Amended August 31, 2009
SB250 Amended May 28, 2009
SB250 Amended May 5, 2009
SB250 Amended April 21, 2009
SB250 Amended April 2, 2009
SB250 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare