|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1924.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2609.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2543.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 797.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 382.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on E., R. & C.A. Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|