LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB288
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB288
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB288
Compare Versions
SB288 Enrolled August 25, 2009
SB288 Amended July 16, 2009
SB288 Amended June 15, 2009
SB288 Amended April 21, 2009
SB288 Amended April 14, 2009
SB288 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB288 Enrolled August 25, 2009
SB288 Amended July 16, 2009
SB288 Amended June 15, 2009
SB288 Amended April 21, 2009
SB288 Amended April 14, 2009
SB288 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare