|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 574, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2426.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Read third time. Amended. (Page 3375.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3376.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Returned to Assembly for further action. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 2404.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Urgency clause refused adoption. Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 1. Page 2342.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Calderon. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2342.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 2353.)
|
|
|
|
09/05/2009
|
Set for hearing September 8.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2763.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 519.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 396.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|