LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB291
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB291
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB291
Compare Versions
SB291 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB291 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB291 Amended September 11, 2009
SB291 Amended August 24, 2009
SB291 Amended July 13, 2009
SB291 Amended June 26, 2009
SB291 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB291 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB291 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB291 Amended September 11, 2009
SB291 Amended August 24, 2009
SB291 Amended July 13, 2009
SB291 Amended June 26, 2009
SB291 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare