|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1139.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1069.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 701.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 421.)
|
|
|
|
03/18/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1. Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|