LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB303
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB303
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB303
Compare Versions
SB303 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB303 Amended September 2, 2009
SB303 Amended August 17, 2009
SB303 Amended July 7, 2009
SB303 Amended April 27, 2009
SB303 Amended April 16, 2009
SB303 Amended April 14, 2009
SB303 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB303 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB303 Amended September 2, 2009
SB303 Amended August 17, 2009
SB303 Amended July 7, 2009
SB303 Amended April 27, 2009
SB303 Amended April 16, 2009
SB303 Amended April 14, 2009
SB303 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare