|
11/02/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 640, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
11/02/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/20/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2524.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 0. Page 2454.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2455.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3061.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2910.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1011.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 702.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|