California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill October 15, 2009

Chaptered

Bill November 2, 2009

Amended

Bill September 2, 2009
Bill August 24, 2009
Bill June 29, 2009
Bill April 27, 2009
Bill April 20, 2009