LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB334
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB334
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB334
Compare Versions
SB334 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB334 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB334 Amended July 15, 2009
SB334 Amended June 30, 2009
SB334 Amended May 6, 2009
SB334 Amended April 23, 2009
SB334 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB334 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB334 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB334 Amended July 15, 2009
SB334 Amended June 30, 2009
SB334 Amended May 6, 2009
SB334 Amended April 23, 2009
SB334 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare