California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB334 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 334CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 349 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 2, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 15, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Ducheny FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to amend Section 17072.10 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 334, Ducheny. School facilities: new construction grant eligibility: special education pupils. The Leroy F. Greene School Facilities Act of 1998 requires the State Allocation Board to allocate to applicant school districts prescribed per-unhoused-pupil state funding for construction and modernization of school facilities, including hardship funding, and supplemental funding for site development and acquisition. The act requires the board to determine maximum total new construction grant eligibility of an applicant under a specified calculation that includes certain per-unhoused-pupil grant amounts, and authorizes the board to adjust the per-unhoused-pupil grant amounts by regulation for qualifying individuals with exceptional needs. This bill would require an increase made to the per-unhoused-pupil grant amounts also to be made to the per-unhoused-pupil who is a qualifying individual with exceptional needs grant amounts. If an increase to the per-unhoused-pupil grant amounts differentiates among the pupil groups based on whether the pupils are elementary, middle, or high school pupils, the bill would require the Office of Public School Construction to recommend to the board a methodology to adjust those amounts for pupils who are qualifying individuals with exceptional needs so that they reflect these increases. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 17072.10 of the Education Code is amended to read: 17072.10. (a) The board shall determine the maximum total new construction grant eligibility of an applicant by multiplying the number of unhoused pupils calculated pursuant to Article 3 (commencing with Section 17071.75) in each school district with an approved application for new construction, by the per-unhoused-pupil grant as follows: (1) Five thousand two hundred dollars ($5,200) for elementary school pupils. (2) Five thousand five hundred dollars ($5,500) for middle school pupils. (3) Seven thousand two hundred dollars ($7,200) for high school pupils. (b) The board annually shall adjust the per-unhoused-pupil apportionment to reflect construction cost changes, as set forth in the statewide cost index for class B construction as determined by the board. (c) Regulations adopted by the board prior to July 1, 2000, that adjust the amounts identified in this section for qualifying individuals with exceptional needs, as defined in Section 56026, as amended after July 1, 2000, in consideration of the recommendations provided pursuant to Section 17072.15, shall continue in effect. An increase made to the per-unhoused-pupil grant amounts set forth in subdivision (a), on or after January 1, 2010, including, but not limited to, those made pursuant to Section 17072.11 on or after January 1, 2010, also shall be made to the per-unhoused-pupil who is a qualifying individual with exceptional needs grant amounts established pursuant to this subdivision. If an increase to the per-unhoused-pupil grant amounts differentiates among the pupil groups based on whether the pupils are elementary, middle, or high school pupils, the Office of Public School Construction shall recommend to the board, within 60 days of that increase, a methodology to adjust the per-unhoused-pupil grant amount for pupils who are qualifying individuals with exceptional needs so that those adjustments appropriately reflect the increases. (d) The board may establish a single supplemental per-unhoused-pupil grant in addition to the amounts specified in subdivision (a) based on the statewide average marginal difference in costs in instances where a project requires multilevel school facilities due to limited acreage. The application of a school district shall demonstrate that a practical alternative site is not available. (e) For a school district having an enrollment of 2,500 or less for the prior fiscal year, the board may approve a supplemental apportionment of up to seven thousand five hundred dollars ($7,500) for any new construction project assistance. The amount of the supplemental apportionment authorized pursuant to this subdivision shall be adjusted in 2008 and every year thereafter by an amount equal to the percentage adjustment for class B construction.