|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3040.) Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From Special Consent Calendar. Ordered returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2763.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1012.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 730.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|