LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB337
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB337
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB337
Compare Versions
SB337 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB337 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB337 Amended September 4, 2009
SB337 Amended August 17, 2009
SB337 Amended July 7, 2009
SB337 Amended June 17, 2009
SB337 Amended May 6, 2009
SB337 Amended April 22, 2009
SB337 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB337 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB337 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB337 Amended September 4, 2009
SB337 Amended August 17, 2009
SB337 Amended July 7, 2009
SB337 Amended June 17, 2009
SB337 Amended May 6, 2009
SB337 Amended April 22, 2009
SB337 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare