|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 350, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2022.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2710.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2674.) To third reading. (Corrected August 25.)
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Action rescinded whereby bill read third time, passed, and to Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From Special Consent Calendar. To unfinished business. Ordered returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2487.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 623.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 497.)
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|