LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB340
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB340
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB340
Compare Versions
SB340 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB340 Enrolled September 2, 2009
SB340 Amended August 20, 2009
SB340 Amended July 2, 2009
SB340 Amended June 24, 2009
SB340 Amended June 16, 2009
SB340 Amended April 21, 2009
SB340 Amended April 2, 2009
SB340 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB340 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB340 Enrolled September 2, 2009
SB340 Amended August 20, 2009
SB340 Amended July 2, 2009
SB340 Amended June 24, 2009
SB340 Amended June 16, 2009
SB340 Amended April 21, 2009
SB340 Amended April 2, 2009
SB340 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare