|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (Heard in Committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (June 7 amended measure version corrected June 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 1193.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5. Page 1026.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 585.)
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Corrected April 13.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|