LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB346
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB346
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB346
Compare Versions
SB346 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB346 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB346 Amended August 25, 2010
SB346 Amended August 20, 2010
SB346 Amended August 2, 2010
SB346 Amended June 21, 2010
SB346 Amended June 7, 2010
SB346 Amended June 24, 2009
SB346 Amended June 1, 2009
SB346 Amended May 20, 2009
SB346 Amended April 23, 2009
SB346 Amended April 2, 2009
SB346 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB346 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB346 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB346 Amended August 25, 2010
SB346 Amended August 20, 2010
SB346 Amended August 2, 2010
SB346 Amended June 21, 2010
SB346 Amended June 7, 2010
SB346 Amended June 24, 2009
SB346 Amended June 1, 2009
SB346 Amended May 20, 2009
SB346 Amended April 23, 2009
SB346 Amended April 2, 2009
SB346 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare