|
08/21/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1893.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2615.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1172.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 874.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected April 22.)
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|