LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB348
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB348
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB348
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 25, 2009
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 20, 2009
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
August 21, 2009
Compare
Amended
Bill
July 14, 2009
Compare
Bill
May 28, 2009
Compare
Bill
May 20, 2009
Compare
Bill
April 13, 2009
Compare