|
06/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2708.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 675.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|