LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB356
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB356
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB356
Compare Versions
SB356 Amended June 22, 2010
SB356 Amended January 12, 2010
SB356 Amended January 11, 2010
SB356 Amended May 11, 2009
SB356 Amended April 16, 2009
SB356 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB356 Amended June 22, 2010
SB356 Amended January 12, 2010
SB356 Amended January 11, 2010
SB356 Amended May 11, 2009
SB356 Amended April 16, 2009
SB356 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare