|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3063.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 797.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 477.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|