California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB357 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 357CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 181 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 6, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 1, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Ducheny (Coauthor: Assembly Member Jeffries) FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to amend Section 12718 of the Government Code, relating to gaming. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 357, Ducheny. Tribal gaming: grants to local jurisdictions. Existing law creates in the State Treasury the Indian Gaming Special Distribution Fund for the receipt and deposit of moneys received by the state from certain Indian tribes pursuant to the terms of gaming compacts entered into with the state. Existing law authorizes moneys in that fund to be used for specified purposes, including grants to local jurisdictions to mitigate the impacts of tribal casinos. Existing law, until January 1, 2010, requires the Controller to take specified actions to administer moneys in the fund in connection with those grants, and establishes procedures for awarding those grants. This bill would extend the operation of the above provisions relating to the administration and awarding of grants to local jurisdictions until January 1, 2021. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12718 of the Government Code is amended to read: 12718. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends that date.