|
09/12/2009
|
In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on September 11.) Read second time. Amended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 16. Page 3409.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3381.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 3042.) Re-referred to Com. On U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Corrected July 6.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 895.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 807.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|