California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2009

Amended

Bill September 12, 2009
Bill September 4, 2009
Bill July 14, 2009
Bill June 29, 2009
Bill April 27, 2009
Bill April 22, 2009
Bill April 16, 2009
Bill April 1, 2009