|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2270.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 930.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 699.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. (Corrected May 4.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|