BILL NUMBER: SB 396ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 3, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Calderon FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to amend Section 1707.7 of the Insurance Code, relating to the Insurance Commissioner. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 396, Calderon. Insurance Commissioner: reports. Existing law requires the commissioner, on or before the first day of August to make a report to the Governor, the Legislature, and the committees of the Senate and Assembly having jurisdiction over insurance containing a tabular statement and synopsis showing the general condition of insurance, and related matters, in this state. This bill would require the commissioner to include in this report information, by license type, relating to the number of first-time insurance license examinees who passed the exam, their overall pass rate, the total number of examinations, the mean examination score for examinees, and, for license types with an overall pass rate of less than 65%, ethnicity/race, gender, and level of education data for applicants, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1707.7 of the Insurance Code is amended to read: 1707.7. As part of the report required under Section 12922, the commissioner shall provide the following information for the previous calendar year ending December 31 for five years after the operative date of this section: (a) The total number of applications filed for a fire and casualty broker-agent license, a personal lines broker-agent license, a limited lines auto-only agent license, a life-only agent license, and an accident and health agent license. (b) The number of first-time examinees who passed the exam and their overall pass rate for each category of license described in subdivision (a). (c) The total number of examinations and the mean examination score for all examinees for each category of license described in subdivision (a). (d) The total number of licensees issued a fire and casualty license, a personal lines license, a limited lines automobile license, a life-only license, and an accident and health license. (e) The total number of licensees with both a life-only agent license and an accident and health agent license. (f) The total justified complaints against the licensees enumerated in subdivision (d) annually for five years. (g) At the end of five years following the issuance of auto-only agent, life-only agent and accident and health agent licenses, a cumulative summary of the data required by this section compared to the licenses issued for fire and casualty broker-agent, personal lines broker-agent, and life agent for the year immediately preceding the creation of this section. (h) (1) Effective January 1, 2011, if the overall pass rate reported pursuant to subdivision (b) for any category of license is less than 65 percent, then the commissioner shall calculate, for that category of license, based on demographic information voluntarily provided by applicants, the pass rate of examinees by each of the following: (A) Ethnicity/race. (B) Gender. (C) Level of education. (2) The commissioner shall include the information received pursuant to paragraph (1) in the next annual report required under Section 12922. The department may request ethnicity/race, gender, and level of education information from applicants for any category of license specified in this section.