|
08/30/2010
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 44. Noes. 28. Page 6840.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 33. Noes 38. Page 6879.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Motion to reconsider continued to August 30.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 34. Noes 38. Page 6609.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Fuentes.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6433.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69 (d) suspended. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 6303.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 34. Noes 30. Page 6236.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on January 12.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1146.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1070.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 480.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|