LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB399
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB399
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB399
Compare Versions
SB399 Amended August 20, 2010
SB399 Amended August 16, 2010
SB399 Amended June 22, 2010
SB399 Amended June 25, 2009
SB399 Amended May 28, 2009
SB399 Amended May 11, 2009
SB399 Amended May 5, 2009
SB399 Amended April 29, 2009
SB399 Amended April 28, 2009
SB399 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB399 Amended August 20, 2010
SB399 Amended August 16, 2010
SB399 Amended June 22, 2010
SB399 Amended June 25, 2009
SB399 Amended May 28, 2009
SB399 Amended May 11, 2009
SB399 Amended May 5, 2009
SB399 Amended April 29, 2009
SB399 Amended April 28, 2009
SB399 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare