|
08/02/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3196.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 27. Page 4363.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 24. Page 4340.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Brownley. Reconsideration granted. By unanimous consent. (Page 4341.)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 4262.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 10. Noes 7.) Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
To Coms. on G.O. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 892.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 339.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|