LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB4
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB4
Compare Versions
SB4 Enrolled April 16, 2010
SB4 Amended March 11, 2010
SB4 Amended July 13, 2009
SB4 Amended June 18, 2009
SB4 Amended May 5, 2009
SB4 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
SB4 Enrolled April 16, 2010
SB4 Amended March 11, 2010
SB4 Amended July 13, 2009
SB4 Amended June 18, 2009
SB4 Amended May 5, 2009
SB4 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare