|
04/12/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 3115.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 4544.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on April 7.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee April 6.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) in Com. on REV. & TAX. suspended. Joint Rule 62(a) in Com. on APPR. suspended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1143.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1070.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 638.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|