LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB401
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB401
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB401
Compare Versions
SB401 Amended August 31, 2009
SB401 Amended July 15, 2009
SB401 Amended July 1, 2009
SB401 Amended May 28, 2009
SB401 Amended April 28, 2009
SB401 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB401 Amended August 31, 2009
SB401 Amended July 15, 2009
SB401 Amended July 1, 2009
SB401 Amended May 28, 2009
SB401 Amended April 28, 2009
SB401 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare