|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 587, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2419.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 3340.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3039.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1190.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 875.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 609.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|